Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.497 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1787 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9348A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.417 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.417 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | print number 10173a | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | referred to local governments |