Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.422 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 225C | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.686 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a3412b | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1598 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 225B | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 225A |