Senate | 11/25/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.540 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.87 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a28c | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 509B | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | referred to cities | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 509A | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.250 |