Senate | 10/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.531 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.750 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a2893a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1068 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 580A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |