Senate | 05/15/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A266A | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3114A | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.431 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |