Senate | 05/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3190A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |