Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.595 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.854 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a6871b | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6441B | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1580 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6441A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |