Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7271 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1025 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7007A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 2 |