Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.183 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.556 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a7445 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7363A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |