New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S07363 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/19/2023

   
  STATE OF NEW YORK ________________________________________________________________________ 7363--A 2023-2024 Regular Sessions  IN SENATE May 19, 2023 ___________ Introduced by Sen. COONEY -- read twice and ordered printed, and when printed to be committed to the Committee on Procurement and Contracts -- committee discharged, bill amended, ordered reprinted as amended and recommitted to said committee AN ACT to amend part X of chapter 62 of the laws of 2003 amending the general business law and other laws generally relating to implementing the state fiscal plan for the 2003-2004 state fiscal year, in relation to extending certain provisions of the general municipal law and the local finance law relating to electronic bidding The People of the State of New York, represented in Senate and Assem- bly, do enact as follows: 1 Section 1. Section 41 of part X of chapter 62 of the laws of 2003 2 amending the general business law and other laws generally relating to 3 implementing the state fiscal plan for the 2003-2004 state fiscal year, 4 as amended by chapter 70 of the laws of 2018, is amended to read as 5 follows: 6 § 41. This act shall take effect immediately; provided, however, 7 (a) that sections four, five, six, seven, eight and nine of this act 8 shall expire June 1, [2023] 2028 when upon such date the provisions of 9 such sections shall be deemed repealed; 10 (b) section thirty-nine of this act shall be deemed to have been in 11 full force and effect on and after April 1, 2003; provided that the 12 provisions of subdivision 9 of section 54 of the state finance law, as 13 added by section thirty-nine of this act, shall expire and be deemed 14 repealed at the close of the state fiscal year ending on March 31, 2004; 15 and 16 (c) section forty of this act shall be deemed to have been in full 17 force and effect on and after April 1, 2003. 18 § 2. This act shall take effect immediately; provided, however, that 19 if this act shall become a law on or after June 1, 2023, this act shall 20 take effect immediately and shall be deemed to have been in full force 21 and effect on and after such date. EXPLANATION--Matter in italics (underscored) is new; matter in brackets [ ] is old law to be omitted. LBD11594-02-3