Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1181 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |