Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1891 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8908A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |