Senate Resolution No. 486 BY: Senator TEDISCO COMMENDING Allen L. Ayotte posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Services from the State of New York, who have served so valiantly and honorably in wars in which this country's freedom was at stake, as well as in the preservation of peace in peacetime, deserve a special salute from this Legislative Body; and WHEREAS, This Legislative Body is justly proud to commend Allen L. Ayotte posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate, to be celebrated at the Saratoga County Honor A Deceased Veteran Ceremony on Tuesday, March 18, 2025; and WHEREAS, The New York State Senate Liberty Medal was established by Resolution and is awarded to individuals who have merited special commendation for exceptional, heroic, or humanitarian acts on behalf of their fellow New Yorkers; and WHEREAS, Born on December 7, 1946, to John and Evalina (Venne) Ayotte, Allen L. Ayotte joined the WK Mansfield Hose Company, West Crescent Fire District, serving his community as a volunteer when he was just 16 years of age; he graduated from Shenendehowa High School in 1965; and WHEREAS, Allen L. Ayotte joined the United States Air Force on August 9, 1965, and served as a Protective Equipment Specialist; and WHEREAS, In June 1967, Allen L. Ayotte was deployed to Vietnam, where he served until July 1968 with the 16th Tactical Reconnaissance Squadron at Ton Son Nhut Air Base in Saigon; during his time there, Allen worked on protective equipment for flight crews and supported search and rescue operations; and WHEREAS, For his contributions in Vietnam, Allen L. Ayotte received the Air Force Commendation Medal, the Air Force Good Conduct Medal, National Defense Service Medal, Vietnam Service Medal, and the Republic of Vietnam Campaign Medal; and WHEREAS, Allen L. Ayotte was honorably discharged on December 8, 1968, at the esteemed rank of Sergeant; and WHEREAS, Upon the completion of his military service, Allen L. Ayotte joined the Capitol Police where he was an officer for 11 years; he then went on to become a Fire Protection Specialist for the Office of Fire Protection and Control, retiring in 2022; and WHEREAS, Allen and Denise Ayotte were united in marriage on September 16, 1978, and together they raised two daughters, Stephanie and Christina; and WHEREAS, As a 48-year active member of WK Mansfield Hose Company, Allen L. Ayotte held many offices including Chairman of the Board of Commissioners; he was also a member and past Commander of the Clifton Park-Halfmoon VFW Post No. 1498; and WHEREAS, With a steadfast and unwavering commitment to his community, Allen L. Ayotte was a member of the American Legion Mohawk Post No. 1450, the Halfmoon Historical Society, the Halfmoon Republican Committee and Club, the Halfmoon Senior Center, NYS Fire Chiefs, and the FASNY; and WHEREAS, Allen L. Ayotte died on December 20, 2022, at the age of 76; and WHEREAS, Residents of this great State must never forget the courage with which these men and women served their country, and must recognize that no greater debt is owed than that owed to those who risked their lives for their beloved Nation and to those who continue to be missing in action; and WHEREAS, Having exhibited his patriotism both at home and abroad, Allen L. Ayotte demonstrated his love for his country and merits forevermore the highest respect of his State and Nation; and WHEREAS, Our Nation's veterans deserve to be recognized, commended and thanked by the people of the State of New York for their service and for their dedication to their communities, their State and their Nation; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to commend Allen L. Ayotte posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to the family of Allen L. Ayotte.