Senate | 04/08/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 115A | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |