Assembly | 03/10/2025 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.202 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |