LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S00187
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S00187
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2025-2026 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S00187
Action History
Senate
05/01/2025
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
04/30/2025
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
04/29/2025
1ST REPORT CAL.765
Senate
01/30/2025
PRINT NUMBER 187A
Senate
01/30/2025
AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Senate
01/08/2025
REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION