Assembly | 04/01/2025 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.239 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |