Senate | 05/06/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2025 | referred to agriculture | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.747 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |