Assembly | 04/08/2025 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.572 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |