Senate | 02/14/2025 | SIGNED CHAP.71 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.83 | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | substituted for a2433 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.14 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES |