Senate | 02/14/2025 | SIGNED CHAP.72 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.80 | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | substituted for a1678 | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2025 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.15 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES |