Senate | 01/27/2025 | SIGNED CHAP.5 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | substituted for a915 | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | referred to children and families | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.32 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES |