Senate | 03/20/2025 | SIGNED CHAP.110 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | substituted for a4045 | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2025 | referred to children and families | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.63 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES |