Senate | 02/28/2025 | SIGNED CHAP.99 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.105 | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | substituted for a5686 | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.94 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES |