Senate | 04/09/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2025 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 904A | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.141 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |