Assembly | 04/01/2025 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.590 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |