Assembly | 04/30/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2025 | substituted for a6423a | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2025 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 952B | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 952A | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |