Assembly | 04/30/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.159 | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2025 | substituted for a3398 | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |