Assembly | 03/12/2025 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.402 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | PRINT NUMBER 1194A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |