Assembly | 03/24/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | ordered to third reading cal.65 | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | substituted for a3392a | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.367 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | PRINT NUMBER 1261A | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |