Senate | 05/01/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.773 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | PRINT NUMBER 1353A | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/09/2025 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |