Assembly | 04/02/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | substituted for a4632 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.279 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2025 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |