Assembly | 03/11/2025 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2025 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |