Assembly | 04/28/2025 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |