Senate | 03/18/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |