Assembly | 02/25/2025 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |