Assembly | 03/24/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |