Assembly | 04/22/2025 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.135 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |