Assembly | 03/26/2025 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.496 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |