Assembly | 04/01/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | ordered to third reading cal.78 | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | substituted for a6138 | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2025 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.294 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |