Assembly | 04/09/2025 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.268 | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |