Assembly | 03/11/2025 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.215 | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |