Assembly | 03/11/2025 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.303 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |