Assembly | 03/25/2025 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.296 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |