Senate | 03/26/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2025 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.473 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |