Assembly | 03/24/2025 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.339 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |