Assembly | 03/17/2025 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.411 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |