Assembly | 04/07/2025 | ordered to third reading cal.86 | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | substituted for a1388 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.396 |