Senate | 05/05/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3236A | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | referred to higher education | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.454 |