Assembly | 04/08/2025 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.140 | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | substituted for a6457 | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3579A | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.334 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |